AZ SB1134 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Adjutant general; annual report
Title
Adjutant general; annual report
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-01 - Senate - Senate Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (28-0-2-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (59-0-1-0) | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-16 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Consent Calendar February 07, 2011 @ 2:45 PM | |
2011-02-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-18 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate VMA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Assigned to Senate VMA Committee | |
2011-01-18 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |