AZ SB1137 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
African-American affairs fund; appropriation
Title
African-American affairs fund; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-03-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0) |
2014-03-06 | House | Referred to House APPROP Committee |
2014-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2014-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |