AZ SB1140 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-04 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
TPT; exemptions; Indian tribes
Title
TPT; exemptions; Indian tribes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-2-0) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Affiliated Indians
Conditional Enactment
Exemption
Indian Tribes
Tax Exemptions
Taxation - Title 42
Tpt
Transaction Privilege Tax
Transportation - Title 28
Tribal Entities
Tribally Owned Businesses
Use Tax
Conditional Enactment
Exemption
Indian Tribes
Tax Exemptions
Taxation - Title 42
Tpt
Transaction Privilege Tax
Transportation - Title 28
Tribal Entities
Tribally Owned Businesses
Use Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2154.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6017 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |