AZ SB1155 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Electronic; digital devices; stalking; threatening
Title
Electronic; digital devices; stalking; threatening
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-11 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-1-2-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-17 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House read second time | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-03 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 1:30 PM | |
2011-02-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-19 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |