AZ SB1197 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-02-21 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Virtual currency; property tax exemption
Title
Virtual currency; property tax exemption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - Senate - Senate Finance and Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2024-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2024-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-02-16 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-10-4-0) |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | Senate FICO Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FICO Committee |
2024-01-24 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Conditional Enactment
Definition
Exemption For Virtual Currency
Property Tax Exemption
Property Tax Exemptions
Taxation - Title 42
Virtual Currency
Definition
Exemption For Virtual Currency
Property Tax Exemption
Property Tax Exemptions
Taxation - Title 42
Virtual Currency