AZ SB1202 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
County treasurer; excess foreclosure proceeds
Title
County treasurer; excess foreclosure proceeds
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-20 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-13 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-13 | House third reading , voting: (48-7-5-0) | |
2010-04-12 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-08 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-24 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-16 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-16 | House read second time | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-03 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (28-0-1-0) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained | |
2010-02-08 | Senate Consent Calendar February 08, 2010 @ 1:48 PM with Objections | |
2010-02-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) | |
2010-01-27 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-27 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |