AZ SB1221 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on April 25 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-25 - Chapter 234
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Attorney general representation; nonparty subpoena.
Title
Attorney general representation; nonparty subpoena.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Adam Driggs [R] | Sen. Steve Gallardo [D] | Rep. Gail Griffin [R] |
Sen. John McComish [R] | Sen. Lynne Pancrazi [D] | Sen. Don Shooter [R] | Sen. Anna Tovar [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-25 | Chapter 234 | |
2014-04-25 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2014-03-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-20 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-24 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-24 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |