AZ SB1226 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-15 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Predominant aggressor; domestic violence; arrest
Title
Predominant aggressor; domestic violence; arrest
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-15 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-19 - House - House Public Safety, Military and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-05 - Senate - Senate Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-15 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-15 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-03-31 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-31 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | House PSMRA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House PSMRA Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate PS Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate PS Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |