AZ SB1229 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Recreational users; landowner liability
Title
Recreational users; landowner liability
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Rep. Russell Jones [R] | Sen. John McComish [R] |
Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Sen. John Nelson [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] | Rep. Amanda Reeve [R] |
Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-31 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-12 | Senate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-12 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-06 | House third reading , voting: (58-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-24 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-03-22 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-22 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-21 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-0-0-4-0) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-24 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-22 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-02-22 | House read second time | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-07 | Senate Consent Calendar February 07, 2011 @ 2:45 PM | |
2011-02-08 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-08 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-07 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-0-0) | |
2011-01-26 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |