AZ SB1247 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Conservation easement; in lieu payments
Title
Conservation easement; in lieu payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - Motion Allen motion not withstanding House Rule 33(D) that SB 1247 be brought for 3rd reading. Motion passed by v/v. (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House Federalism, Property Rights and Public Policy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC W/FL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources, Energy and Water Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Governor Vetoed | |
2017-05-10 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | House miscellaneous motion: Allen motion not withstanding House Rule 33(D) that SB 1247 be brought for 3rd reading. Motion passed by v/v. |
2017-05-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-21-5-0) |
2017-05-09 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-21 | House | House FPRPP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-08 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Assigned to House FPRPP Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-23 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-12-0-0) |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate NREW Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NREW Committee |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |