AZ SB1255 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School courses; mastery of competency
Title
School courses; mastery of competency
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-01-30 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-29 | Governor Signed | |
2012-03-28 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-28 | Senate final reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-28 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-28 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-20 | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-3-3-0) | |
2012-03-15 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-03-12 | House Consent Calendar March 12, 2012 @ 1:43 PM with Objections | |
2012-03-13 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-13 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-21 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-2-0) | |
2012-02-22 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2012-02-22 | House read second time | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-16 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-16 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-09 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-06 | Senate Consent Calendar February 06, 2012 @ 1:17 PM with Objections | |
2012-02-07 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-07 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-06 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-24 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) | |
2012-01-25 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-01-25 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2012-01-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |