AZ SB1284 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Referred to House WM Committee
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-14 - Referred to House WM Committee
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
County general excise tax rate
Title
County general excise tax rate
Sponsors
Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Sen. Jack Jackson [D] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Rep. Bob Thorpe [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2013-03-14 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-13 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Assigned to House AW Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2013-03-13 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-0) |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |