AZ SB1316 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-20 - Senate minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Consumer lending; regulations; licensure
Title
Consumer lending; regulations; licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-21 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 31 N: 26 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-20 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-21 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-03-21 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (31-26-3-0) |
2016-03-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2016-03-08 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-08 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-07 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-1-0) |
2016-02-24 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | House WM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2016-02-25 | House | Referred to House WM Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2016-02-24 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |