AZ SB1318 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
City council; vacancy; appointment; election
Title
City council; vacancy; appointment; election
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P ON REREF) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P ON REREF) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-09 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-26 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | House third reading , voting: (50-8-2-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-28 | House Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 3:07 PM | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-11 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form on rereferral, voting: (5-1-1-2-0) | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-2-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to House GOV Committee | |
2011-03-01 | House read second time | |
2011-04-07 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Assigned to House GOV Committee | |
2011-02-28 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-22 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Consent Calendar February 14, 2011 @ 1:30 PM | |
2011-02-17 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |