AZ SB1374 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona development authority; technical correction
Title
Arizona development authority; technical correction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-22 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate GR Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-10 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |