AZ SB1374 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health examiners board
Title
Behavioral health examiners board
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 10 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-06-13 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (48-10-2-0) |
2013-06-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-04-16 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-16 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-10 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) |
2013-03-06 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: proper For Consideration with Recommendation for a Floor Amendment |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |