AZ SB1374 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - House read second time
Pending: House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - House read second time
Pending: House Municipal Oversight & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Foreign donations; election administration; certification
Title
Foreign donations; election administration; certification
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - Senate - Senate Elections Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House MOE Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-12-2-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Senate ELEC Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-2-0-0) |
2024-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ELEC Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Certification
Classification
Conduct Of Elections
Definition
Election Administration
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Foreign Donations
Records
Reports
Violation
Classification
Conduct Of Elections
Definition
Election Administration
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Foreign Donations
Records
Reports
Violation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
16 | 407.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 407.05 | New Code | See Bill Text |