AZ SB1416 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-04 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Property tax; agriculture classification; affidavit
Title
Property tax; agriculture classification; affidavit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - House - House Ways and Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-04 | Governor Signed | |
2012-04-02 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Transmit to Senate | |
2012-03-27 | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-1-3-0) | |
2012-03-19 | House Consent Calendar March 19, 2012 @ 4:40 PM | |
2012-03-20 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-20 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-29 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-05 | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-03-01 | Referred to House WM Committee | |
2012-03-01 | House read second time | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Assigned to House WM Committee | |
2012-02-29 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-23 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-23 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-30 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Senate WLRD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-1-0) | |
2012-02-06 | Referred to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-30 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-06 | Assigned to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2012-01-30 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |