AZ SB1432 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-27 - House majority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State department of corrections; continuation
Title
State department of corrections; continuation
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - House - House Military Affairs and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-08 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-03-26 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-08 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0) | |
2012-02-27 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2012-03-07 | House MAPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Referred to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-28 | House read second time | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Assigned to House MAPS Committee | |
2012-02-27 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-02-23 | Transmit to House | |
2012-02-23 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-16 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2012-02-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-13 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Senate PSHS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |