AZ SB1448 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Chapter 277
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
State treasurer; public monies; procedures
Title
State treasurer; public monies; procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-26 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Chapter 277 |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (54-0-6-0) |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-09 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-28 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Approval
Convenience Fees
Fees
Procedures
Public Finances
Public Monies
Service Fees
State Treasurer
Surcharges
Convenience Fees
Fees
Procedures
Public Finances
Public Monies
Service Fees
State Treasurer
Surcharges
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 142 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
35 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |