AZ SB1503 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-23 - Referred to House RULES Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Low-profit limited liability companies
Title
Low-profit limited liability companies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-23 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-23 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-23 | House COM Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (2-5-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-2-4-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 1:35 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate CE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate CE Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |