AZ SB1505 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nursing supported group homes; licensure
Title
Nursing supported group homes; licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Access To Facilities
Adult Foster Care
Annual Inspection
Community Developmental Disability Services
Definitions
Department Of Health Services
Effective Date
Electronic Monitoring Devices
Exceptions
Group Homes
Health Care Institutions
Intermediate Care Facilities
Licensing
Licensure
Notification Requirements
Nursing Supported Group Homes
Policies
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rules
Service Providers
Adult Foster Care
Annual Inspection
Community Developmental Disability Services
Definitions
Department Of Health Services
Effective Date
Electronic Monitoring Devices
Exceptions
Group Homes
Health Care Institutions
Intermediate Care Facilities
Licensing
Licensure
Notification Requirements
Nursing Supported Group Homes
Policies
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rules
Service Providers
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 401 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 425.07 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 557 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 568 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 595.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |