AZ SB1521 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-18 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; head injury policies; athletics
Title
Schools; head injury policies; athletics
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Arredondo [D] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Chad Campbell [D] | Sen. Rich Crandall [R] |
Sen. Russell Pearce [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-18 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-13 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-13 | Senate final reading , voting: (30-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-13 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-13 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-12 | House third reading , voting: (45-14-1-0) | |
2011-04-11 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-07 | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-0-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-03 | Referred to House ED Committee | |
2011-03-03 | House read second time | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Assigned to House ED Committee | |
2011-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (27-2-1-0) | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-21 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-21 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-1-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate ED Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |