AZ SB1593 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 16-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health insurance; interstate purchase
Title
Health insurance; interstate purchase
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 18 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 17 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 37 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 18 N: 33 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-13 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 17 N: 34 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - House - House Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-15 - Senate - Senate Banking and Insurance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Senate final reading , voting: (21-8-1-0) | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | House third reading , voting: (37-21-2-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-11 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-1-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-21 | House BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-1-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House BI Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House BI Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-09 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-10-0-0) | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Senate BI Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate BI Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |