AZ SB1605 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Senate third reading , voting: (12-14-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-03 - Senate third reading , voting: (12-14-4-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
RFP; advertising in newspapers; repeal
Title
RFP; advertising in newspapers; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Scott Bundgaard [R] | Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Sen. Russell Pearce [R] |
Sen. Steve Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Government Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (12-14-4-0) | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2011 @ 1:35 PM with Objections | |
2011-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate GR Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-1-1-0) | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |