AZ SB1655 | 2024 | Fifty-sixth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - House HHS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-7-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - House HHS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-7-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Behavioral health entities; regulation
Title
Behavioral health entities; regulation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (FAILED) (Y: 3 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | House HHS Committee action: Failed To Pass, voting: (3-7-0-0-0-0) |
2024-03-18 | House | House read second time |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2024-03-14 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2024-03-12 | House | Transmit to House |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2024-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2024-02-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Application For License
Behavioral Health Residential Facilities
Civil Penalties
Civil Penalty
Class 6 Felony
Definitions
Effect On Licensure
Exemption
Health Care Institutions
Health Services Licensing Fund
Indigenous Peoples Protection Revolving Fund
Initial Evaluation
Inspections
Intent
Issuance Of License
Joint Licenses
Legal Action Or Sale
Monitoring Fee
Nursing Care Institution Resident Protection Revolving Fund
Nutrition And Feeding Assistants
Powers And Duties
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Regulation
Revocation Of License
Rulemaking Exemption
Suspension Of License
Termination Of Operation
Training Programs
Use Of Monies
Violations
Behavioral Health Residential Facilities
Civil Penalties
Civil Penalty
Class 6 Felony
Definitions
Effect On Licensure
Exemption
Health Care Institutions
Health Services Licensing Fund
Indigenous Peoples Protection Revolving Fund
Initial Evaluation
Inspections
Intent
Issuance Of License
Joint Licenses
Legal Action Or Sale
Monitoring Fee
Nursing Care Institution Resident Protection Revolving Fund
Nutrition And Feeding Assistants
Powers And Duties
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Regulation
Revocation Of License
Rulemaking Exemption
Suspension Of License
Termination Of Operation
Training Programs
Use Of Monies
Violations
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 405 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 414 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 422.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 425.10 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 425.11 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 431.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 431.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 431.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 431.04 | New Code | See Bill Text |