AZ SCM1009 | 2012 | Fiftieth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - House ENV Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - House ENV Committee action: Discussed and Held
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Rotenone; EPA; deregistration
Title
Rotenone; EPA; deregistration
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2012-02-15 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | House ENV Committee action: Discussed and Held | |
2012-03-05 | Referred to House ENV Committee | |
2012-03-05 | House read second time | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Assigned to House ENV Committee | |
2012-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2012-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2012-03-01 | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (20-10-0-0) | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate Consent Calendar February 23, 2012 @ 11:23 AM with Objections | |
2012-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2012-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2012-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-02-15 | Senate WLRD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (3-2-1-0) | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Assigned to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2012-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |