AZ SCR1032 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-11 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-11 - Transmit to Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
New tax; election; supermajority approval
Title
New tax; election; supermajority approval
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] |
Rep. Gail Griffin [R] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] |
Sen. Don Shooter [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-16 - Senate - Senate Water, Land Use and Rural Development Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-11 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-03-10 | House third reading , voting: (16-14-0-0) | |
2011-03-01 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-02-24 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to House Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to House Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to House Committee | |
2011-02-01 | House read second time | |
2011-03-11 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-10 | Senate third reading , voting: (16-14-0-0) | |
2011-03-01 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-24 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Senate WLRD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-2-0-0) | |
2011-02-14 | Referred to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-14 | Assigned to Senate WLRD Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |