CA AB1091 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 685 to the Business and Professions Code, to add Sections 5931, 5932, and 5933 to the Corporations Code, to add Sections 1255.4 and 1371.26 to the Health and Safety Code, and to add Section 10123.149 to the Insurance Code, relating to health care.
Title
Health Care Consolidation and Contracting Fairness Act of 2023.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2024-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HEALTH and JUD. |
2023-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 18. |
2023-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 685 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 5931 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 5932 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Corporations Code | 5933 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1255.4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 1371.26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Insurance Code | 10123.149 | New Code | See Bill Text |