CA AB1140 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 1 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 17072 and 19184 of, to amend and repeal Sections 17131.4, 17131.5, 17215.1, and 17215.4 of, and to add Section 17216 to, the Revenue and Taxation Code, relating to taxation, to take effect immediately, tax levy.
Title
Income tax: health savings accounts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-01 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2018-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-01-04 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. |
2017-04-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2017-03-27 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2017-03-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. |
2017-02-19 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 21. |
2017-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17072 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17131.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17215.1 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17215.4 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 17216 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Revenue and Taxation Code | 19184 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billStatusClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1140 |
Text | http://leginfo.legislature.ca.gov/faces/billTextClient.xhtml?bill_id=201720180AB1140 |