CA AB1149 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 93, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 93, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 101315 of the Health and Safety Code, relating to public health emergencies, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
Public health emergencies: funding.
Sponsors
Asm. Jim Wood [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1149 Wood By Hernandez (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1149 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-06-22 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Assembly - AB 1149 WOOD Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Assembly - Amend, and do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 93, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-07-14 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-07-02 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1616.). |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-22 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 22). |
2015-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1450.). |
2015-05-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2015-03-01 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 31. |
2015-02-27 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Health and Safety Code | 101315 | Amended Code | Citation Text |