CA AB115 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on September 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal and add Article 6.8 (commencing with Section 14199.60) of Chapter 7 of Part 3 of Division 9 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to Medi-Cal, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, bill related to the budget.
Title
Medi-Cal: managed care organization provider tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 115 BUDGET Concurrence in Senate Amendments By TING (Y: 55 N: 13 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB115 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 115 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-12 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB115 BUDGET (Ting) By Mitchell (Y: 29 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - Assembly - AB 115 Ting Assembly Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 13 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-27 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 348, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-09-27 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 13. Page 3488.). |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 3466.) |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2019-09-12 | Senate | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 29. Noes 11. Page 2901.). |
2019-09-11 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (September 10). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 2690.) |
2019-08-30 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-08-29 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-08-26 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 13. Page 1185.) |
2019-04-08 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Ordered to second reading. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from committee. |
2019-04-04 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 15. Page 1032.) |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2018-12-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee January 3. |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 14199.60 | New Code | See Bill Text |