CA AB1186 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 13 (commencing with Section 16429.40) to Chapter 2 of Part 2 of Division 4 of Title 2 of the Government Code, relating to greenhouse gases.
Title
School Energy Efficiency and Greenhouse Gas Reduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1186 SKINNER Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 47 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1186 Skinner By De León (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1186 SKINNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1186 Skinner By De León (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-07-02 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-19 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-12 - Assembly - AB 1186 SKINNER Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - Assembly - Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2012-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6803.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 47. Noes 27. Page 6803.). | |
2012-08-31 | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5066.) Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 5066.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 5077.) Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. No | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-08-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-07-03 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-21 | Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-06-19 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-06-11 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2012-06-06 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2012-05-22 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |
2011-06-20 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |
2011-05-26 | Referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |
2011-05-12 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2011-05-12 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 1353.) | |
2011-05-09 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |
2011-05-05 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 4). | |
2011-04-12 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2011-03-29 | Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. | |
2011-03-25 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. | |
2011-02-20 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 22. | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 16429.40 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Health and Safety Code | 38578 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities Code | 372 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 398.4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Public Utilities Code | 640 | New Code | See Bill Text |