CA AB1191 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act relating to the grant of public trust lands to the City of Oakland.
Title
State Lands Commission: exchange of trust lands: City of Oakland: Howard Terminal property: Oakland Waterfront Sports and Mixed-Use Project, Waterfront Access, Environmental Justice, and Revitalization Act.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] | Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] | Asm. Buffy Wicks [D] |
Sen. Bob Wieckowski [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-12 - Assembly - AB 1191 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1191 Bonta et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1191 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-11 - Assembly - With recommendation: That Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-09 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1191 Bonta et al. By Wieckowski (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-25 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Assembly - AB 1191 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Local Government] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 752, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-12 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 72. Noes 1. Page 3475.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (September 11). |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 3303.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3252.) |
2019-09-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 11 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2706.). |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-05 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-02 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 25). |
2019-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-22 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 69. Noes 1. Page 1827.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (May 16). |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | (pending re-referral to Com. on L. GOV.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 1150.) |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. |
2019-03-19 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and L. GOV. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 24. |
2019-02-21 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |