CA AB1321 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-03 - From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1170.125 and 1192.7 of the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Serious felonies.
Sponsors
Sen. Brian Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - Assembly - Reconsideration granted (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-03 | Assembly | From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. |
2014-01-31 | Assembly | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. |
2014-01-14 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2013-04-09 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Held without recommendation. |
2013-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2013-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2013-02-24 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 26. |
2013-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 1170.125 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1192.7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |