CA AB1331 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on October 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 13150, 13151, and 13202 of the Penal Code, relating to criminal justice data.
Title
Criminal justice data.
Sponsors
Asm. Rob Bonta [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-09-11 - Assembly - AB 1331 Bonta Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1331 Bonta By Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1331 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1331 Bonta By Mitchell (Y: 27 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1331 Bonta Assembly Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 13 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-08 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 581, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-08 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-24 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 59. Noes 11. Page 3416.). |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 3370.) |
2019-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after September 12 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2019-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2748.). |
2019-09-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-09-06 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2019-09-03 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-11 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 9). |
2019-06-26 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 2115.) |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 5.) (May 16). |
2019-05-01 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Penal Code | 13150 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Penal Code | 13151 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 13202 | Amended Code | Citation Text |