CA AB1336 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 18285 of the Welfare and Institutions Code, relating to public social services.
Title
Child health and safety fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Special Consent AB1336 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1336 Smith Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - Assembly - AB 1336 Smith Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Assembly - Do pass. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 47, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-07-01 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-06-25 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11 a.m. |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1679.). |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 10). |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-04-25 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 1359.) |
2019-04-11 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2019-04-10 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Welfare and Institutions Code | 18285 | Amended Code | Citation Text |