CA AB134 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2015 by amending Items 0650-001-3228, 3900-001-3228, and 4700-001-3228 of, and adding Items 2665-001-3228, 3860-001-3228, 3860-101-3228, 3900-101-3228, 4700-101-3228, and 8570-001-3228 to, Section 2.00 of, and amending Section 39.00 of, that act, relating to the State Budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Assembly - AB 134 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By WEBER (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2015-09-11 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 24. Noes 3. Page 2737.) Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Mitchell. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Senate Rule 29.3(b) suspended. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2695.) From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-09-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2015-03-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 651.) |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 25. Page 611.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-01-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Read first time. From printer. May be heard in committee February 11. |
2015-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |