CA AB1354 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-10-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Section 48647 of the Education Code, relating to juvenile court school pupils.
Title
Juvenile court school pupils: joint transition planning policy: individualized transition plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-04 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1354 Gipson et al. By Portantino (Y: 31 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1354 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-30 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-12 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-09 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-26 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1354 Gipson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 64 N: 8 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-11 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 756, Statutes of 2019. | |
2019-10-11 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2019-09-11 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. |
2019-09-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. |
2019-09-04 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 8. Page 2525.). |
2019-08-30 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-08-30 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 30). |
2019-08-12 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-07-09 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-06-26 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2019-06-12 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S. |
2019-05-30 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2019-05-29 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 64. Noes 8. Page 2109.) |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 3.) (May 16). |
2019-04-24 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2019-04-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2019-04-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (March 27). |
2019-03-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on ED. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Read first time. |
2019-02-23 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 25. |
2019-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 48647 | Amended Code | Citation Text |