CA AB1461 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on September 30 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-30 - Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 1363 and 1399.829 of, to amend the heading of Article 11.7 (commencing with Section 1399.825) of Chapter 2.2 of Division 2 of, to add Section 1399.836 to, to add Article 11.8 (commencing with Section 1399.845) to Chapter 2.2 of Division 2 of, and to repeal Section 1399.816 of, the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Section 10965.3 of the Insurance Code, relating to health care coverage.
Title
Individual health care coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1461 MONNING Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 51 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1461 Monning By Hernandez (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1461 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-29 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1461 Monning By Hernandez (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-16 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-06 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-29 - Assembly - AB 1461 MONNING Assembly Third Reading (Y: 50 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-25 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-17 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-30 | Consideration of Governor's veto pending. | |
2012-09-30 | Vetoed by Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:15 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 6748.). | |
2012-08-30 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. | |
2012-08-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 12. Page 4934.). | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-21 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-20 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16). | |
2012-08-06 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-06-28 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-06-07 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-05-29 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-05-29 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 27. Page 5039.) | |
2012-05-25 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-04-25 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |
2012-04-18 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 6.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2012-04-10 | Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-04-09 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. Read second time and amended. | |
2012-01-19 | Referred to Com. on HEALTH. | |
2012-01-10 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 9. | |
2012-01-09 | Read first time. To print. |