CA AB1486 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 28 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-09-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add and repeal Section 21080.25 of the Public Resources Code, relating to the environment, and declaring the urgency thereof, to take effect immediately.
Title
California Environmental Quality Act: exemption: Los
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-08-31 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB1486 Lara Urgency Clause (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1486 LARA Concurrence in Senate Amendments Urgency Added (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1486 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - AB 1486 LARA Concurrence in Senate Amendments Urgency Added (Y: 62 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2012-08-31 - Assembly - Senate amendments be concurred in (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-08-30 - Senate - From Committee: That the measure be returned to the Senate floor for consideration (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - Assembly - AB 1486 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By BLUMENFIELD (Y: 47 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-28 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 690, Statutes of 2012. | |
2012-09-28 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2012-09-13 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |
2012-08-31 | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 6762.) From committee: That the Senate amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 31). Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Page 6772.) Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 62. Noes 3. | |
2012-08-31 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 5. Page 5058.). | |
2012-08-30 | From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (August 30). Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-29 | Joint Rules 33.1 and 61(b)(15) suspended. (Page 4938.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice waived. (Page 4938.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q. | |
2012-08-27 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |
2012-08-24 | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-08-20 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-08-16 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. | |
2012-06-07 | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. | |
2012-04-19 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2012-03-22 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2012-03-22 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 23. Page 4093.) | |
2012-03-19 | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 24. Page 4011.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading. Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |
2012-02-09 | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. | |
2012-01-11 | From printer. May be heard in committee February 10. | |
2012-01-10 | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Public Resources Code | 21080.25 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |