CA AB1573 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-07 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 65592, 65593, 65596, and 65598 of the Government Code, relating to water.
Title
Water conservation: landscape design: model ordinance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1573 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-08-28 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1573 Friedman Assembly Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-07 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Stern. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (September 1). |
2023-08-28 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-08-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-10 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-07-06 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 3). |
2023-06-21 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-06-19 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Com. on N.R. & W. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 18. Page 2016.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (May 18). |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 4.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-03-23 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on W., P., & W. |
2023-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 65592 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65593 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65596 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 65598 | Amended Code | Citation Text |