CA AB1599 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-11-30 - Died on Senate inactive file.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend the Budget Act of 2015 (Chapters 10 and 11 of the Statutes of 2015) by augmenting Items 9840-001-0001 and 9840-001-0494 of Section 2.00 of that act, relating to the state budget, and making an appropriation therefor, to take effect immediately, budget bill.
Title
Budget Act of 2015: augmentation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-13 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1599 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - AB 1599 BUDGET Assembly Third Reading By TING (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Senate | Died on Senate inactive file. |
2016-08-23 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno. |
2016-06-14 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-13 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.R. From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 13). |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.R. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 51. Noes 26. Page 4569.) |
2016-04-25 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 25. Page 4488.) Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-18 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on BUDGET. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on BUDGET. |
2016-01-08 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 7. |
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |