CA AB1599 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Failed on October 24 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-10-24 - From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to repeal Chapter 33 (commencing with Section 7599) of Division 7 of Title 1 of the Government Code, to amend Sections 11350 and 11377 of the Health and Safety Code, and to amend Sections 368, 473, 476a, 487, 496, and 666 of, and to repeal Sections 459.5, 490.2, and 1170.18 of, the Penal Code, relating to crimes.
Title
Proposition 47: repeal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-26 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Reconsideration (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 2 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-24 | Assembly | From committee: Without further action pursuant to Joint Rule 62(a). |
2022-04-26 | Assembly | In committee: Set, second hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-03-09 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | In committee: Reconsideration granted. |
2022-03-08 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. |
2022-03-02 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-01-14 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. |
2022-01-04 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 3. |
2022-01-03 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Government Code | 7599 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11350 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Health and Safety Code | 11377 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 1170.18 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 368 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 459.5 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 473 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 476 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 487 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 490.2 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 496 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Penal Code | 666 | Amended Code | Citation Text |