CA AB1671 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Patterson.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-08-22 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Patterson.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Article 22.5 (commencing with Section 70026) to Chapter 2 of Part 42 of Division 5 of Title 3 of the Education Code, relating to student financial aid.
Title
California Ban on Scholarship Displacement for Foster Youth Act of 2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - Senate - Consent Calendar AB1671 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - AB 1671 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-13 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-01 - Senate - Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Human Services] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-21 - Assembly - AB 1671 Patterson Assembly Third Reading (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2022-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-22 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-08-22 | Assembly | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Patterson. |
2022-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after July 29 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2022-06-30 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4574.). |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-27 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2022-06-01 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2022-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on ED. and HUMAN S. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2022-04-21 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4368.) |
2022-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2022-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2022-03-23 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-03-16 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-03 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. |
2022-03-02 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2022-03-01 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on HUM. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 1). |
2022-01-27 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on HIGHER ED. and HUM. S. |
2022-01-20 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 19. |
2022-01-19 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Education Code | 70026 | New Code | See Bill Text |