CA AB1747 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-19 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 20 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-08-19 - From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 21084.2 to the Public Resources Code, relating to environmental quality.
Title
Environmental quality: development projects: mineral
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-20 - Assembly - AB 1747 GALGIANI Assembly Third Reading (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-05 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-08-19 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2010-05-20 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |
2010-05-20 | Read third time, passed, and to Senate. (Ayes 66. Noes 0. Page 5239.) | |
2010-04-22 | Read second time. To third reading. | |
2010-04-21 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (April 21). | |
2010-04-15 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |
2010-04-14 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |
2010-04-06 | From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Re-referred. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (April 5). | |
2010-02-18 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. | |
2010-02-09 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 11. | |
2010-02-08 | Read first time. To print. |