CA AB1747 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 4600.5, 4602, and 4612 of, and to add Section 4601.1 to, the Business and Professions Code, and to amend Sections 51030 and 51032 of, and to add Section 51032.3 to, the Government Code, relating to massage therapy.
Title
Massage therapy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2014-04-01 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. |
2014-03-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B.,P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. |
2014-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 20. |
2014-02-14 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 4600.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4601.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Business and Professions Code | 4612 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51030 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51032 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Government Code | 51032.3 | New Code | See Bill Text |