CA AB1755 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-09-13 - Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend, repeal, and add Sections 4055, 4057, 4058, 4061, 4062, 4063, 17400, 17404.1, 17430, and 17432 of, to add Sections 3635 and 17432.5 to, and to repeal Chapter 5 (commencing with Section 3620) of Part 1 of Division 9 of, the Family Code, relating to child support.
Title
Child support.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-09-01 - Senate - Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1755 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-08-21 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-03 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-27 - Senate - Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Human Services] (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-31 - Assembly - AB 1755 JUD. Assembly Third Reading By MAIENSCHEIN (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-18 - Assembly - Do pass as amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Skinner. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-11 | Senate | From special consent calendar |
2023-09-08 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2023-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2023-08-21 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR suspense file. |
2023-08-02 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-07-05 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-06-28 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HUMAN S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. |
2023-06-20 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and HUMAN S. |
2023-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2022.) |
2023-05-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. Ordered returned to second reading. |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 18). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 1580.) |
2023-05-17 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2023-05-03 | Assembly | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2023-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. |
2023-03-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | Introduced measure version corrected. |
2023-03-03 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee April 2. |
2023-03-02 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Family Code | 17400 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 17404.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 17430 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 17432 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 4055 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 4057 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 4058 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 4061 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 4062 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Family Code | 4063 | New Code | See Bill Text |