CA AB1784 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-25 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Section 1083 to the Financial Code, relating to financial institutions.
Title
State banks.
Sponsors
Asm. Matt Dababneh [D] | Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D] | Asm. Travis Allen [R] | Asm. Cheryl Brown [D] |
Asm. David Hadley [R] | Asm. Young Kim [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-15 - Assembly - AB 1784 DABABNEH Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1784 Dababneh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 1784 DABABNEH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar 2nd AB1784 Dababneh (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-15 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Assembly - AB 1784 DABABNEH Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - Assembly - Do pass, to Consent Calendar (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-25 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 180, Statutes of 2016. | |
2016-08-25 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2016-08-18 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m. |
2016-08-15 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 5809.). |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 14 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4872.). |
2016-08-02 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-08-01 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. |
2016-05-16 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B. & F.I. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2016-04-14 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4361.) |
2016-04-07 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to Consent Calendar. |
2016-04-06 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (April 6). |
2016-03-15 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2016-03-07 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & F. |
2016-02-05 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. |
2016-02-04 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Financial Code | 1070 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Financial Code | 1083 | New Code | See Bill Text |