CA AB179 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-10-06 - Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
An act to amend Sections 726, 1601.1, 1616.5, 1632, 1638, 1638.1, 1638.3, 1646.6, 1647.8, 1724, 1725, 1742, 1752.1, 2841, 4501, and 4503 of, to amend, repeal, and add Sections 205, 2894, and 4547 of, to add Section 1650.1 to, and to add and repeal Sections 2847.1, 2847.5 and 2858.5 of, the Business and Professions Code, relating to healing arts.
Title
Healing arts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-11 - Assembly - AB 179 BONILLA Concurrence in Senate Amendments (Y: 66 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB179 Bonilla By Hill (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 179 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - Senate - Assembly 3rd Reading AB179 Bonilla By Hill (Y: 32 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-27 - Senate - Do pass as amended (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-08-17 - Senate - Placed on Appropriations Suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-07-06 - Senate - Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-01 - Assembly - AB 179 BONILLA Assembly Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-28 - Assembly - Do pass (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-28 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-06 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 510, Statutes of 2015. | |
2015-10-06 | Approved by the Governor. | |
2015-09-23 | Assembly | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. |
2015-09-11 | Assembly | Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 66. Noes 11. Page 3131.). |
2015-09-10 | Assembly | In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. |
2015-09-10 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 2703.). |
2015-09-08 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-09-04 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2015-08-31 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-08-27 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (August 27). |
2015-08-17 | Senate | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-07-07 | Senate | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (July 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D. |
2015-06-01 | Senate | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 60. Noes 17. Page 1702.) |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-20 | Assembly | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2015-05-04 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2015-04-28 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-04-27 | Assembly | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. Read second time and amended. |
2015-02-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on B. & P. |
2015-01-27 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee February 26. |
2015-01-26 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |